NC H3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Eminent Domain

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent Domain

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-02-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-02-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-25HousePlaced On Cal For 02/27/2019
2019-02-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-02-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-20HouseReptd Fav
2019-01-31HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-01-31HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S27 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback