NC H30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Official State Frozen Treat
Title
Official State Frozen Treat
Sponsors
Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] |
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/06/2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2019-02-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-07 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |