NC H318 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Ch. SL 2013-250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Ch. SL 2013-250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Seismic Codes
Title
Winston-Salem/Seismic Codes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Ch. SL 2013-250 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-08 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2013 |
2013-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-27 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-01 | House | Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Environmental |
2013-03-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2013-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2013-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S296 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government