NC H318 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-29 - Ch. SL 2015-294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-29 - Ch. SL 2015-294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protect North Carolina Workers Act
Title
Protect North Carolina Workers Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 12 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 12 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-29 | Ch. SL 2015-294 | |
2015-10-29 | Signed by Gov. 10/29/2015 | |
2015-09-30 | Pres. To Gov. 9/30/2015 | |
2015-09-29 | Ratified | |
2015-09-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015 |
2015-09-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-09-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-28 | Engrossed | |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Amend Failed A5 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2015-09-24 | Engrossed | |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary IV |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed |