NC H324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Local Hunting Omnibus
Title
Local Hunting Omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Ch. SL 2019-107 | |
2019-07-11 | Ratified | |
2019-07-10 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-10 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-09 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-12 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |