NC H326 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-14 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-14 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Buncombe Local Sales Tax for Comm. Colleges
Title
Buncombe Local Sales Tax for Comm. Colleges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-09-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-07-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-14 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |