NC H326 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. SL 2013-174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. SL 2013-174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rutherford County Condemnation Consent
Title
Rutherford County Condemnation Consent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Ch. SL 2013-174 | |
2013-06-20 | Ratified | |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/02/2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-19 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Filed |