NC H327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Fees/Returned Checks/Loan Processing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Returned Checks/Loan Processing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-12HouseRef to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S529 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Re-ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback