NC H329 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Amends
Title
Renewable Energy Amends
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Ch. SL 2019-132 | |
2019-07-19 | Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2019 | |
2019-07-09 | Ratified | |
2019-07-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-08 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-07-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-04 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-02 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-04 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/03/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |