NC H337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Ch. SL 2019-153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change Salvage Vehicle Transfer Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change Salvage Vehicle Transfer Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22 Ch. SL 2019-153
2019-07-22 Signed by Gov. 7/22/2019
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-04HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-04HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-02HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-07-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-19SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-09HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-13HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S248 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback