NC H343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize LSC/Criminal Record Checks
Title
Authorize LSC/Criminal Record Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - A1 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed |