NC H345 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Equal Tax Treatment of Gov't Retiree Benefits.
Title
Equal Tax Treatment of Gov't Retiree Benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-02 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S233 (Same As) 2011-03-08 - Ref To Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H345 |