NC H345 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Ch. SL 2012-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Ch. SL 2012-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Move Over Law
Title
Modify Move Over Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-05 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Ch. SL 2012-14 | |
2012-06-11 | Signed By Gov. 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Ratified | |
2012-06-05 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-05-31 | Placed On Cal For 6/5/2012 | |
2012-05-31 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-29 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2012-05-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-05-25 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-05-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-25 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Placed On Cal For 5/24/2011 | |
2011-05-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-21 | Serial Referral Changed to Judiciary A | |
2011-04-13 | Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-15 | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-03-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Filed |