NC H345 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Penalties for Misuse of 911 System
Title
Increase Penalties for Misuse of 911 System
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] |
Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A1 Faircloth Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A1 Faircloth Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-286 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-11 | Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2013 | |
2013-07-10 | Ratified | |
2013-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-09 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013 |
2013-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-14 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2013-05-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-03 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2013-03-20 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed |