NC H357 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School Absence for Religious Holidays
Title
School Absence for Religious Holidays
Sponsors
Rep. Cary Allred [R] | Rep. Alice Bordsen [D] | Rep. Bob England [D] | Rep. Linda Johnson [R] |
Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-112 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-03-31 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Cal For 3/26/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-11 | Re-ref Com On Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform | |
2009-03-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-03 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform | |
2009-03-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S248 (Same As) 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-277