NC H363 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Pres. To Gov. 5/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Craft Beer Distribution & Modernization Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft Beer Distribution & Modernization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Pres. To Gov. 5/22/2019
2019-05-21 Ratified
2019-05-20SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-20SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-20SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-15SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-08SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-08SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-18HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S246 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback