NC H364 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

House UNC BOG Election

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House UNC BOG Election

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - A1 Lewis R2 For Adoption (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 63 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAdopted
2019-03-20HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-03-20HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-03-19HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-19HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-18HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback