NC H365 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Special Election Chatham Co. School Bd
Title
Special Election Chatham Co. School Bd
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2013-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Government |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |