NC H366 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Farm Act of 2014
Title
NC Farm Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. James Langdon [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-01 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 9 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 9 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Ch. SL 2014-103 | |
2014-08-06 | Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014 | |
2014-08-02 | Pres. To Gov. 8/2/2014 | |
2014-08-02 | Ratified | |
2014-08-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-01 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2014-07-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/31/2014 |
2014-07-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-30 | House | Ruled Material |
2014-07-30 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2014-07-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-07-29 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2014 |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance |
2014-07-24 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2014 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-03 | House | Fail To Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-03 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-03 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-07-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-30 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2014-06-30 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-06-26 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Added |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/04/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S387 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-155