NC H370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Require Cooperation with ICE Detainers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require Cooperation with ICE Detainers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - A1 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - A2 Smith, C. Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-25SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-03HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-04-03HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government
2019-03-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-18HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback