NC H371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Education
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Planning Funds/ECU Brody School of Medicine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning Funds/ECU Brody School of Medicine

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Education
2019-04-16HouseReptd Com Sub w/o Prejud
2019-03-19HouseRef to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S183 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback