NC H372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

UNC AP Scores & Funds/NCSSM-Morganton Campus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNC AP Scores & Funds/NCSSM-Morganton Campus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-31 - House - A1 Russell Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-07-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-08-05SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-08-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-31HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-31HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-31HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-07-30HousePlaced On Cal For 07/31/2019
2019-07-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-24HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-07-24HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-23HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-23HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations, Education Stricken
2019-07-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-19HouseRef to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S180 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback