NC H375 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize Teacher-Gov't Emp'ee Housing/Bertie
Title
Authorize Teacher-Gov't Emp'ee Housing/Bertie
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-19 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S8 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate