NC H380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Aerial Adventure Courses/Sanders' Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aerial Adventure Courses/Sanders' Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-03HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03HouseRe-ref Com On Insurance
2019-04-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-03-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-03-20HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback