NC H384 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Register of Deeds/Fees
Title
Register of Deeds/Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. Annie Mobley [D] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
Rep. Roger West [R] | Rep. Winfrey Wilkins [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - A1 Howard\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - A1 Howard\Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Ch. SL 2011-296 | |
2011-06-24 | Signed By Gov. 6/24/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Com Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2011-06-06 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-03 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-03 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-17 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Filed |