NC H385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Herd Shares
Title
Prohibit Herd Shares
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Turner [R] | Rep. Carla Cunningham [D] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] |
Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Nasif Majeed [D] | Rep. Gregory Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-04-03 | House | Serial Referral To Health Added |
2019-04-03 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-03-28 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-03-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Agriculture |
2019-03-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-20 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S509 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H385 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H385v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H385v1.pdf |