NC H386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Ensure Safety of School Drinking Water
Title
Ensure Safety of School Drinking Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-13 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2019-06-13 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations, Education Stricken |
2019-06-13 | House | Serial Referral To Health Stricken |
2019-06-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-06 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-06-06 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2019-06-06 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations, Education Stricken |
2019-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H386 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H386v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H386v1.pdf |