NC H387 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Certain Criminal Provisions.-AB
Title
Amend Certain Criminal Provisions.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/04/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |