NC H387 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Electric Co-Op Rural Broadband Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Co-Op Rural Broadband Services

Sponsors

Rep. Larry Arp [R]Rep. John Szoka [R]Rep. David Lewis [R]Rep. Howard Hunter [D]
Rep. Gale Adcock [D]Rep. Cynthia Ball [D]Rep. Lisa Barnes [R]Rep. Chaz Beasley [D]
Rep. Larry Bell [D]Rep. MaryAnne Black [D]Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R]Rep. William Brisson [R]
Rep. Cecil Brockman [D]Rep. Deb Butler [D]Rep. Becky Carney [D]Rep. Jerry Carter [R]
Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D]Rep. George Cleveland [R]Rep. Debra Conrad [R]Rep. Harold Corbin [R]
Rep. Carla Cunningham [D]Rep. Allison Dahle [D]Rep. James Dixon [R]Rep. Joshua Dobson [R]
Rep. Terence Everitt [D]Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D]Rep. Susan Fisher [D]Rep. Elmer Floyd [D]
Rep. John Fraley [R]Rep. Terry Garrison [D]Rep. Rosa Gill [D]Rep. Kenneth Goodman [D]
Rep. Edward Goodwin [R]Rep. Charles Graham [D]Rep. Holly Grange [R]Rep. Destin Hall [R]
Rep. Kyle Hall [R]Rep. Bobby Hanig [R]Rep. Wesley Harris [D]Rep. Kelly Hastings [R]
Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D]Rep. Cody Henson [R]Rep. Yvonne Holley [D]Rep. Dwight Horn [R]
Rep. Julia Howard [R]Rep. Chris Humphrey [R]Rep. Patricia Hurley [R]Rep. Francis Iler [R]
Rep. Verla Insko [D]Rep. Darren Jackson [D]Rep. Steve Jarvis [R]Rep. Joseph John [D]
Rep. Keith Kidwell [R]Rep. Carolyn Logan [D]Rep. Marvin Lucas [D]Rep. Nasif Majeed [D]
Rep. David Martin [D]Rep. Patricia McElraft [R]Rep. Charles McGrady [R]Rep. Allen McNeill [R]
Rep. Graig Meyer [D]Rep. Derwin Montgomery [D]Rep. Marcia Morey [D]Rep. Garland Pierce [D]
Rep. Larry Pittman [R]Rep. Michele Presnell [R]Rep. Joe Queen [D]Rep. Amos Quick [D]
Rep. Robert Reives [D]Rep. Dennis Riddell [R]Rep. Stephen Ross [R]Rep. Ray Russell [D]
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R]Rep. John Sauls [R]Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R]Rep. Phillip Shepard [R]
Rep. Carson Smith [R]Rep. Kandie Smith [D]Rep. Raymond Smith [D]Rep. Sarah Stevens [R]
Rep. Larry Strickland [R]Rep. Evelyn Terry [D]Rep. John Torbett [R]Rep. Brian Turner [D]
Rep. Rena Turner [R]Rep. Julie von Haefen [D]Rep. Harry Warren [R]Rep. Donna White [R]
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D]Rep. Michael Wray [D]Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R]Rep. Walter Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-20HouseRef to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S310 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Ch. SL 2019-17

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback