NC H388 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Ch. SL 2019-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Immunizing Pharmacists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunizing Pharmacists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03 Ch. SL 2019-21
2019-06-03 Signed by Gov. 6/3/2019
2019-05-30 Pres. To Gov. 5/30/2019
2019-05-29 Ratified
2019-05-28SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/28/2019
2019-05-23SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-22SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-09HousePlaced On Cal For 04/10/2019
2019-04-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-08HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-02HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-20HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback