NC H391 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Ch. SL 2019-194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Passenger Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Passenger Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-30 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09 Ch. SL 2019-194
2019-08-09 Signed by Gov. 8/9/2019
2019-08-02 Pres. To Gov. 8/2/2019
2019-08-01 Ratified
2019-07-30HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-30HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-29HousePlaced On Cal For 07/30/2019
2019-07-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-23HousePlaced On Cal For 07/24/2019
2019-07-23HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-23HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-23SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-22SenateEngrossed
2019-07-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-22SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-08SenateRe-ref Com On Transportation
2019-07-08SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-08SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-02SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-27SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-06-27HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2019
2019-06-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-26HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-21HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-04HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-06-04HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-20HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H391
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H391v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/566
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/504
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/503
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/709

Bill Comments

feedback