NC H398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Info. Tech. Budget/2019-2021 Fiscal Biennium

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Info. Tech. Budget/2019-2021 Fiscal Biennium

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - House - A1 Autry Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-10-24 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - House - M8 Re-Refer Education - Universities Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-11-08HouseReceived from the Governor
2019-11-08 Vetoed 11/08/2019
2019-11-01 Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019
2019-10-31 Ratified
2019-10-30SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-30SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-30SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-30SenateAmend Tabled A2
2019-10-30SenateAmend Tabled A1
2019-10-29SenateReptd Fav
2019-10-28SenateRef To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-10-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-10-25HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-24HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-10-23HousePlaced On Cal For 10/24/2019
2019-10-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-10-17HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2019-10-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-17HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-04-09HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Information Technology
2019-04-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-21HouseRef to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Appropriations, Information Technology, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H398
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H398v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H398v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H398v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H398v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H398v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/861
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/860
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/859
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/858
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/633
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/632
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/631

Bill Comments

feedback