NC H399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-21)
Status: Passed on November 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Ch. SL 2019-237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-21)
Status: Passed on November 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Ch. SL 2019-237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Tax Credits/Other Finance Changes
Title
Extend Tax Credits/Other Finance Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-24 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | Ch. SL 2019-237 | |
2019-11-01 | Signed by Gov. 11/1/2019 | |
2019-10-29 | Pres. To Gov. 10/29/2019 | |
2019-10-28 | Ratified | |
2019-10-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-24 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-23 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2019-10-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-10-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-23 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-22 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2019-10-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-10-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-22 | House | Reptd Unfav For Conc |
2019-10-17 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2019-10-17 | House | Ruled Material |
2019-10-14 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-10-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-06-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2019-05-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed |