NC H402 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

UNC Capital Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNC Capital Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19 Ch. SL 2019-124
2019-07-19 Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019
2019-07-09 Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2019
2019-07-08 Ratified
2019-07-01SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-17SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-13SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-06-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/11/2019
2019-06-06HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-04HousePlaced On Cal For 06/05/2019
2019-06-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-04HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-29HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-29HouseRuled Material
2019-05-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-26HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-26HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21HouseRef to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-20HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback