NC H409 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shelby Deannexation
Title
Shelby Deannexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Ch. SL 2013-218 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed |