NC H409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
State Agencies/Adjust Hiring Practices
Title
State Agencies/Adjust Hiring Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed |