NC H41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allison's Law/GPS Tracking Pilot/DV/Funds
Title
Allison's Law/GPS Tracking Pilot/DV/Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] |
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Derwin Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-01 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |