NC H426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Educators' Pay Increases/Retiree Supplements
Title
Educators' Pay Increases/Retiree Supplements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2019-08-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-08-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-08-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-08-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-08-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2019-08-27 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-08-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-08-26 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-08-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |