NC H429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Navigable Waters/Manteo/Hyde
Title
Navigable Waters/Manteo/Hyde
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Ch. SL 2019-108 | |
2019-07-11 | Ratified | |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-26 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |