NC H431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
FIBER NC Act
Title
FIBER NC Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-08-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |