NC H432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Water/Sewer to Contiguous Dwelling Units

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water/Sewer to Contiguous Dwelling Units

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2019
2019-06-21 Ratified
2019-06-20SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-20SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/20/2019
2019-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-29SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-26HousePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-25HouseRef to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback