NC H434 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Handicap Placard/Med. Recertification
Title
Handicap Placard/Med. Recertification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Ch. SL 2015-29 | |
2015-05-21 | Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015 | |
2015-05-19 | Pres. To Gov. 5/19/2015 | |
2015-05-18 | Ratified | |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |