NC H434 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Suicide Risk Ref./Mental Health/Teen Violence
Title
Suicide Risk Ref./Mental Health/Teen Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |