NC H450 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Contempt/Bail Procedure
Title
Criminal Contempt/Bail Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-303 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2013 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-28 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Filed |