NC H451 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Temp. ABAWD Time Waivers
Title
Temp. ABAWD Time Waivers
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Potts [R] | Rep. Walter Zachary [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] | Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] |
Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020 |
2020-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2020-06-23 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |