NC H463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-17)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Education/Job Readiness in Prisons & Jails

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education/Job Readiness in Prisons & Jails

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-24HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-17HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2019-06-17HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations, Education Stricken
2019-06-11HouseRe-ref Com On Education - Universities
2019-06-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-27HouseRef to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S561 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback