NC H466 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

The Pharmacy Patient Fair Practices Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Pharmacy Patient Fair Practices Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18 Ch. SL 2017-116
2017-07-18 Signed by Gov. 7/18/2017
2017-06-29 Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
2017-06-29 Ratified
2017-06-28SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-16SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-27HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Health
2017-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-27HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Health
2017-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S384 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-176

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback