NC H5 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Ch. SL 2012-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Ch. SL 2012-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Deannexations
Title
Local Deannexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l\M11 Concur (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l\M11 Concur (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 1 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l\M11 Concur (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 1 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Ch. SL 2012-3 | |
2012-05-30 | Ratified | |
2012-05-29 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-24 | Placed On Cal For 5/29/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-05-24 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Placed On Cal For 5/24/2012 | |
2012-05-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-05-23 | Com Sub Ruled Material | |
2012-05-23 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-05-22 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-05-16 | Com Sub Ruled Material | |
2012-05-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-05-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-04-25 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-13 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-03 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Rec From House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-28 | Placed On Cal For 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-02-24 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-02-10 | Pursuant Rule 38(b) | |
2011-02-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-01-31 | Re-ref Com On Government | |
2011-01-31 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-01-27 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-01-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |