NC H5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ch. SL 2017-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ch. SL 2017-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment Insurance Technical Changes
Title
Unemployment Insurance Technical Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Ch. SL 2017-8 | |
2017-04-27 | Signed by Gov. 4/27/2017 | |
2017-04-20 | Pres. To Gov. 4/20/2017 | |
2017-04-19 | Ratified | |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/27/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-23 | House | Ruled Material |
2017-02-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-02-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-01-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7 (Same As) 2017-01-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate