NC H50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Placed On Cal For 07/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Hyperbaric Oxygen Therapy for TBI/PTSD

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Hyperbaric Oxygen Therapy for TBI/PTSD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-26HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-03-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-26HouseRe-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
2019-02-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-13HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S149 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback